Klok, Jennifer Alicia (CPSO#: 92873)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Medical Arts Clinic
Suite 301 - 272 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 2V4
Phone: (705) 876-9003
Fax: (705) 874-5410
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.A. Klok Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 06 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Klok ( CPSO# 92873 )

Business Address:
272 Charlotte Street
Suite 301
Peterborough ON  K9J 7B3
Phone Number: (705) 876-9003

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER ALICIA KLOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLOK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015