Klomfass, Matthias Thorsten (CPSO#: 78311)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Apr 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Apr 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Ruprecht Karl Univ of Heidelberg, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Two Rivers Family Health Team Inc
Hespeler Clinic
Unit 12
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone: (519) 629-4615
Fax: (519) 629-4630
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthias T. Klomfass Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Klomfass ( CPSO# 78311 )

Business Address:
Two Rivers Family Health Team Inc
Hespeler Clinic
B-12 - 350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone Number: (519) 629-4615

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHIAS THORSTEN KLOMFASS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLOMFASS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Jul 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2005