Klurfan, Paula (CPSO#: 81243)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 01 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Buenos Aires, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paula Klurfan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 10 2017

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Jul 2004 to 03 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 16 Nov 2005 to 08 Feb 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 09 Feb 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 23 Nov 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jan 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jan 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018