Knapp, Charles David (CPSO#: 58011)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hungarian

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6520
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dr. Sean Rice
1333 Sheppard Avenue
Suite 345
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Canada
Phone: (416) 391-4048
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

North York General Hospital
Branson Division
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5
Canada
Phone: (416) 633-9420
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Vaughan Endoscopy Clinic
Suite 200
4610 Highway 7
Woodbridge ON  L4L 4Y7
Canada
Phone: (905) 856-2626
Fax: (905) 856-2602
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

The Cumberland Clinic
162 Cumberland St, Suite #225
Toronto, Ontario
Toronto ON  M3R 3N5
Canada
Phone: (416) 925-0113
Fax: (416) 323-1344
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charles David Knapp Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Knapp ( CPSO# 58011 )

Business Address:
Vaughan Endoscopy Clinic
4610 Highway 7
Suite 200
Woodbridge ON  L4L 4Y7
Phone Number: (905) 856-2626

Business Address:
The Cumberland Clinic
Suite 225
162 Cumberland Street
Toronto ON  M3R 3N5
Phone Number: (416) 925-0113

Business Address:
Rice Clinic
Suite 345
1333 Sheppard Avenue
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 391-4048

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6002

Business Address:
North York General - Branson Division
555 Finch Avenue
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5
Phone Number: (416) 633-9420

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 17 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES DAVID KNAPP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KNAPP is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1988