Knibutat, Darren Batram (CPSO#: 95422)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 09 Jun 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Vascular And Interventional
Radiology
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 2381
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Darren Knibutat Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Knibutat ( CPSO# 95422 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Vascular And Interventional
Radiology
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 504-6550

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Connecticut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 09 Jun 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jun 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Feb 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 27 Feb 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 26 Feb 2013 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr.  Darren  Batram  Knibutat  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
                  radiology, only.