Knifed, Eva (CPSO#: 95282)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Hungarian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Discovery Family Health
77 Provost Drive
North York ON  M2K 0B7
Phone: (416) 901-7407
Fax: 4169019780
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EVA KNIFED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KNIFED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 18 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 06 Apr 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2014