Knight, Drew Allister (CPSO#: 93471)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone: (613) 345-5649
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drew A. Knight Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Knight ( CPSO# 93471 )

Business Address:
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 345-5649

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 16 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DREW ALLISTER KNIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KNIGHT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2013