Knox, Matthew Kenny (CPSO#: 92756)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
5M Outpatient Mental Health
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000 Ext. 3080
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW KENNY KNOX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KNOX is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015