Ko, Hin Hin (CPSO#: 92169)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Feb 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 20 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2011