Ko, Hyang Mi (CPSO#: 91434)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 26 Sep 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:Chonnam National University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Laboratory Medicine
and Pathobiology, 11th Floor
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5197
Fax: (416) 340-5517
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Laboratory Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Aug 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Aug 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Hyang Mi Ko may practise medicine independently in anatomical pathology.