Ko, Michael Augustine (CPSO#: 74819)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Care
Sunnyside Wing
Suite 240
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6653
Fax: (416) 530-6114
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Ko Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 03 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ko ( CPSO# 74819 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Care
Sunnyside Wing
Suite 221
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6653

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 05 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL AUGUSTINE KO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008