Ko, Raymond Kwun Hans (CPSO#: 84071)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 May 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 May 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Sydney, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2006 to 17 Apr 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Apr 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 01 May 2007
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 May 2007