Ko, Raynauld (CPSO#: 78037)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 2015

Summary

Date of Death: 11-Aug-2015

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Raynauld Ko Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 26 Aug 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2015