Ko, Yong-Kyong (CPSO#: 82717)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 May 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 May 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 101
13025 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 1A6
Phone: (905) 773-3342
Fax: (905) 773-9669
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Y.K. Ko Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Ko ( CPSO# 82717 )

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3

Business Address:
Suite 101
13025 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 1A6
Phone Number: (905) 773-3342

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 13 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YONG-KYONG KO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 06 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 15 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2010 to 31 Mar 2011
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 2011