Kobaisy, Omaima (CPSO#: 90030)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Dec 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Universidad Iberoamericana(UNIBE), 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa West Medical Centre
760 Eagleson Rd, 2nd floor
Kanata ON  K2M 0A7
Phone: (613) 592-9081
Fax: (613) 592-6554
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kobaisy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Kobaisy ( CPSO# 90030 )

Business Address:
Ottawa West Medical Centre
760 Eagleson Road
2nd Floor
Kanata ON  K2M 0A7
Phone Number: (613) 592-9081

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Sep 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OMAIMA KOBAISY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOBAISY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Nov 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2009