Kobetz, Lawrence Elliot (CPSO#: 26745)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 1974

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 1974

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
835 Paramount Drive
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 0B4
Phone: 905 561 2200
Fax: 905 561 2204
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Kobetz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 11 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Kobetz ( CPSO# 26745 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Medical Records Location

Address: Safe Stor Records Management 2704 Highway 20 Fonthill ON L0S 1E6 Tel: 905-892-0010 Tel 2: 905-380-8616 Fax: 905-892-9465
Date Received: 26 Sep 2016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 15 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAWRENCE ELLIOT KOBETZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOBETZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1974