Kock, Norman (CPSO#: 90051)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universitaet Luebeck, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Dec 2008 to 13 Feb 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 14 Feb 2009 to 01 Oct 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Oct 2009