Koduri, Rajendra Prasad (CPSO#: 80404)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Osmania University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2004 to 13 Feb 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 14 Feb 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2004