Kogan, Eva (CPSO#: 80859)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 May 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
379 Church St. Unit 404A
Markham ON  L6B 0T1
Phone: (905) 471-1444
Fax: (905) 471-1777
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Adult Diabetes Education Center
379 Church St., Unit #308
Markham ON  L6B 0T1
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7527
Fax: (905) 472-7533
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eric Greenwald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Kogan ( CPSO# 80859 )
Dr. E. Greenwald ( CPSO# 77511 )

Business Address:
2F55 - 1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 31 Dec 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EVA KOGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOGAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 May 2009