Kohan, Mehr-Afarin (CPSO#: 93747)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Sep 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: Hosseini-Tabatabaei, Mehr-Afarin (used until: 01 Nov 2017 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Upstate Medical Center State Univ of N Y, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
151 Harbord Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1H1
Phone: (416) 662-0865
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEHR-AFARIN KOHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2015