Kohli, Sandeep Sonny Singh (CPSO#: 76051)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Wharton Medical Clinic
M14-414 Victoria Av
Hamilton ON  L8L 5G8
Canada
Phone: (905) 527-7663
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Wharton medical clinic
2951 Walkers line, 1st floor
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Canada
Phone: (905) 592-2301
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.S. Kohli Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kohli ( CPSO# 76051 )

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
414 Victoria Avenue
Suite M14
Hamilton ON  L8L 5G8
Phone Number: (905) 527-7663

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDEEP SONNY SINGH KOHLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOHLI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005