Kohly, Radha Pyari (CPSO#: 80896)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Ophthalmology
2075 Bayview Avenue Suite M1 202b
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5607
Fax: (415) 480-5675
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kensington Eye Institute
340 College Street, Suite 600
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Canada
Phone: (416) 928-2132
Fax: (416) 928-6607
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

801 Eglinton Ave East, suite 301
Toronto ON  M5N 1E3
Canada
Phone: 647-748-8377
Fax: 416-619-5539
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 212, 2345 Yonge St
Toronto ON  M4P2E5
Canada
Phone: 416-733-2020
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rajeev Muni Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 04 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Muni ( CPSO# 77808 )
Dr. R. Kohly ( CPSO# 80896 )

Business Address:
Hospital for Sick Children
Eye Clinic
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7374

Business Address:
Kensington Eye Institute
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-2123

Business Address:
Clearview Eye Institute
1260 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M3A 1C4
Phone Number: (416) 867-7411

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
801 - 61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-7411


Corporation Name: Dr. Radha Kohly Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Muni ( CPSO# 77808 )
Dr. R. Kohly ( CPSO# 80896 )

Business Address:
Kensington Eye Insititute
600 - 340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-2132

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Opthalmology
2075 Bayview Avenue Suite M1202b
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5607

Business Address:
801 Eglinton Avenue West
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5N 1E3
Phone Number: (647) 748-8377

Business Address:
212 - 2345 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 2E5
Phone Number: (416) 733-2020

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RADHA PYARI KOHLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOHLY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2010