Kolar, Dusan (CPSO#: 96820)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 2011

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2022

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Oct 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Belgrade, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queens University
Department of Psychiatry
Providence Care Hospital
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone: (613) 544-4900
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kolar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kolar ( CPSO# 96820 )

Business Address:
Queen's University, Department of Psychiatry
Providence Care - Mental Health
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 544-4900

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 May 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Oct 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Dusan Kolar may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Psychiatry,  Queen's  University,  in  which  Dr.  Kolar  holds  an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued on October 1, 2011, and expires on June 30,
                  2022.   Upon  renewal of Dr.  Kolar's  academic  appointment  at  Queen's
                  University, the  expiry  date can be extended, subject to the limitations
                  in paragraphs 1 above.