Kolawole, Rebecca Olaide Omowunmi (CPSO#: 96550)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valey Hospital
2200 Eglington Ave W
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rebecca Kolawole Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kolawole ( CPSO# 96550 )

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 03 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA OLAIDE OMOWUNMI KOLAWOLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOLAWOLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 24 Aug 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 25 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Oct 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2014