Kolbasnik, Alexandr (CPSO#: 76077)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10-B Victoria St. S.
Kitchener ON  N2G 1C5
Phone: (519) 783-0022
Fax: (519) 783-0032
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

835 King St. E.
Grand River Hospital
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
Phone: (519) 749-4300
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

250 Laurelwood Drive
University Gates, Long Term Care
Waterloo ON  N2J 0E2
Canada
Phone: (519) 904-0650
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexandr Kolbasnik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kolbasnik ( CPSO# 76077 )

Business Address:
250 Laurelwood Drive
Waterloo ON  N2J 0E2
Phone Number: (519) 904-0650

Business Address:
10B Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 1C5
Phone Number: (519) 783-0022

Business Address:
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 2G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDR KOLBASNIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOLBASNIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2003