Pengelly, Sarah Janine (CPSO#: 77474)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Names: Kolk, Sarah Janine (used until: 25 Sep 2018 )     Pengelly, Sarah Janine (used until: 25 Oct 2004 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Link
Suite 10
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone: (519) 740-5010
Fax: (519) 740-6010
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Andrew's Terrace
255 St. Andrew's Street
Cambridge ON  N1S 1P1
Canada
Phone: (519) 620-9512
Fax: (519) 620-1434
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sarah Kolk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Pengelly ( CPSO# 77474 )

Business Address:
255 St. Andrew's Street
Cambridge ON  N1S 1P1
Phone Number: (519) 620-9512

Business Address:
Health Link
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Suite B10
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone Number: (519) 740-5010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH JANINE PENGELLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PENGELLY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2004