Kolla, Nathan John (CPSO#: 83055)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CAMH
Research Imaging Centre
Room 626
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 34248
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Kolla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Kolla ( CPSO# 83055 )

Business Address:
CAMH
Research Imaging Centre
Suite 626
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATHAN JOHN KOLLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOLLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2010