Kolobov, Anton (CPSO#: 84947)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Ural State Medical Academy, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Hospital
P.O. Box 3251
35 North Algoma Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5G7
Phone: (807) 346-2310
Fax: (807) 345-5126
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

TBRHSC
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: (807) 684-6030
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anton Kolobov Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kolobov ( CPSO# 84947 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
Department of Internal Medicine
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6030

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
35 North Algoma Street
PO Box 3251
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5G7
Phone Number: (807) 346-2310

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 26 Feb 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTON KOLOBOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOLOBOV is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2008