Koltin, Dror (CPSO#: 83461)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Apr 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Apr 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Tel Aviv University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-4120
Fax: (905) 813-4128
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Hospital for Sick Children
The Division of Endocrinology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-6217
Fax: (416) 813-6304
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Boomerang Health
Clinical Solutions LP
The Hospital for Sick Children
9401 Jane Street, Suite 211
Vaughan ON  L6A 4H7
Canada
Phone: (905) 553-3155
Fax: (905) 553-8120
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dror Koltin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 07 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Koltin ( CPSO# 83461 )

Business Address:
The Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-4120

Business Address:
Suite 211
9401 Jane Street
Vaughan ON  L6A 4H7
Phone Number: (905) 553-3155

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
The Division of Endocrinology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-6217

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 15 Apr 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 13 Sep 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Dror  Koltin  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  paediatrics  and
            paediatric endocrinology.