Kondejewski, Richard Joseph (CPSO#: 24656)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Aug 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Texas

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2018

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: August 8, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Richard Joseph Kondejewski to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 8, 2018:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Kondejewski engaged in professional misconduct. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Kondejewski resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: Member
Active Date: December 12, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Richard Joseph Kondejewski to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 12, 2016:

Dr. Kondejewski, subject to the exceptions below, must not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for any of the following substances:

(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);
(iv) Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(v) All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);
and as amended from time to time.

Exceptions:

(vi) Clonazepan for patients with seizure disorders;

(vii) Lorazepam for patients with claustrophobia who are scheduled to undergo an MRI/CT or where patients have a phobia of plane flights;

(viii) Lorazepam, as a sleeping aide, for patients who have been taking the medication for an extended period in which the medication was initiated by another physician;

(ix) ADHD patients requiring refills; and

(x) Testosterone for men receiving hormone replacement

Dr. Kondejewski must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all his Practice Locations, setting out this information.