Kong, Young-Soo Peter (CPSO#: 51910)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1986

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Kong, Young Soo (used until: 23 Oct 2002 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:Seoul National University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2115 Finch Avenue West
Suite 302
Toronto ON  M3N 2V6
Phone: (416) 748-3237
Fax: (416) 748-3277
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Kong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Kong ( CPSO# 51910 )

Business Address:
2115 Finch Avenue West
Suite 302
North York ON  M3N 2V6
Phone Number: (416) 748-3237

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 17 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YOUNG-SOO PETER KONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KONG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1986

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: May 11, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 19, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a “caution-in-person” is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:
Download Full Document (PDF)