Kong, Yuan (CPSO#: 90442)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 307
164 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6V 1B4
Phone: (905) 595-0456
Fax: (905) 595-0434
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 126
8787 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 9S2
Canada
Phone: (905) 513-6870
Fax: (905) 513-5722
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yuan Kong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Kong ( CPSO# 90442 )

Business Address:
Suite 307
164 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6V 1B4
Phone Number: (905) 595-0456

Business Address:
Suite 126
8787 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 9S2
Phone Number: (905) 513-6870

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 30 Nov 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YUAN KONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Jun 2009 to 26 Jun 2009
Elective Trainee - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 23 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2012