Koo, Kevin (CPSO#: 93150)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
72 Copper Creek Drive
Unit 101A
Markham ON  L6B0P2
Phone: 905-201-3584
Fax: 905-294-6074
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: 905-472-7008
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin Koo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Koo ( CPSO# 93150 )

Business Address:
101A - 72 Copper Creek Drive
Markham ON  L6B 0P2
Phone Number: (905) 201-3584

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN KOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014