Koohsari, Suneye (CPSO#: 95581)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: Koohsary, Suneye (used until: 16 Apr 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Aug 2015