Kopac, Daniel Slawomir (CPSO#: 92549)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 311-6051 Gilbert Road Richmond BC V7C 3V3
Date Received: 21 Jun 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 11 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Mar 2010 to 04 Apr 2010
Elective Trainee - Vascular Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Oct 2012 to 16 Dec 2012
Elective Trainee - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jun 2017