Kordy, Faisal Nayel Sulaiman (CPSO#: 94589)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 May 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2010 to 23 Jan 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 24 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 31 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2018 to 31 May 2018
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Dec 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 May 2018