Korman, Mark Jason (CPSO#: 72584)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 617
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone: (905) 792-6949
Fax: (905) 792-6977
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1664 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6H 3M1
Canada
Phone: (416) 652-6101
Fax: (905) 652-1994
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

57 Centre Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 1G2
Canada
Phone: (905) 764-0774
Fax: (905) 881-2393
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Ground Floor
21 Bedford Road
Toronto ON  M5R 2J9
Canada
Phone: (416) 447-4247
Fax: (416) 928-9394
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK JASON KORMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KORMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003