Kosashvili, Yona (CPSO#: 85734)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Tel Aviv University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 23 Oct 2006 to 14 Dec 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 15 Dec 2006 to 22 Jul 2007
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
Research Fellows - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009