Kostandoff, Gregory Hunter (CPSO#: 88403)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Department Of Anesthesia
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33853
Fax: (905) 524-6019
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Anesthesia
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

JHCC
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Canada
Phone: (905) 527-0271
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

HGH
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 527-0271
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

GIHC
32-1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Canada
Phone: (905) 335-1888
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

GHA Surgical Centre
726 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9
Canada
Phone: (905) 575-5743 Ext. 202
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. Kostandoff Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Kostandoff ( CPSO# 88403 )

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-0271

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 527-0271

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
32 - 1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY HUNTER KOSTANDOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOSTANDOFF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 01 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 02 Aug 2011 to 01 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 02 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2013