Kostenuik, Marcia Anne (CPSO#: 75083)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
370 Bayview Drive
L4N7L3
Barrie ON  L4M 1H5
Phone: (705) 220-7245
Fax: (647) 497-5862
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marcia Anne Kostenuik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 06 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kostenuik ( CPSO# 75083 )

Business Address:
137 Collier Street
Barrie ON  L4M 1H5
Phone Number: (705) 220-7245

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARCIA ANNE KOSTENUIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOSTENUIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2002