Kostovic, Biljana (CPSO#: 92720)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 May 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 May 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bosnian, English

Education:University of Sarajevo, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CPM
312 Queen St E
Brampton ON  L6V 1C2
Phone: 905- 458-7377
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Peel Memorial Centre
Brampton ON  L6W2Z8
Canada
Phone: 416-747-3400
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

123 Edward Street 1118
Toronto ON  M5G1E2
Canada
Phone: 416-593-7700
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B. Kostovic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kostovic ( CPSO# 92720 )

Business Address:
Suite 1118
123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone Number: (416) 593-7700

Business Address:
312 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6V 1C2
Phone Number: (905) 458-7377

Business Address:
Peel Memorial Centre
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BILJANA KOSTOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOSTOVIC is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 2010

Concerns

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: August 22, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

On August 22, 2018, the Quality Assurance Committee (“QAC”) required emergency medicine/urgent care physician, Dr. Biljana Kostovic, to complete a specified continuing education and remediation program (“SCERP”). The SCERP requires Dr. Kostovic to:

• Attend and provide proof of successful completion of the following courses:

o University of Toronto Medical Record Keeping
o CMPA Record Keeping Modules 1 & 2

• Practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months;

• Review the following topics with reference to how each is applicable to emergency medicine/urgent care:

o Assessment and management of the patient with undifferentiated fever; and
o Diagnosis and management of acute iritis.

• Undergo a reassessment with an assessor selected by the College, approximately 6 months following the completion of the Education Plan.