Kotecha, Suhas Ashok-Kumar (CPSO#: 84673)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7522
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Suhas Kotecha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kotecha ( CPSO# 84673 )

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 04 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUHAS ASHOK-KUMAR KOTECHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOTECHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2015 to 30 Nov 2015
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2012