Kotowycz, Mark Alexander (CPSO#: 80891)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cardiac Investigation Unit
Royal Victoria Regional Health Ctr
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090 Ext. 46135
Fax: (800) 881-6694
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cardiac Cath Lab
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Cardiac Cath Lab
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

4168 Finch Avenue East, Suite 339
Scarborough ON  M1S 5H6
Canada
Phone: (416) 291-0051
Fax: (416) 291-0552
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark A. Kotowycz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kotowycz ( CPSO# 80891 )

Business Address:
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9802

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 De Palma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 372-6811

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Business Address:
339 - 4168 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 5H6
Phone Number: (416) 291-0051

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 16 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK ALEXANDER KOTOWYCZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOTOWYCZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2009