Kotrec, Marian (CPSO#: 83741)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, Slovak

Education:Univerzita Komenskeho,Bratislava, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cardiology Associates of Niagara
464 Welland Ave
St Catharines ON  L2M 5V4
Phone: (905) 935-0312
Fax: (905) 935-2949
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

7885 McLeod Rd, #114
GNMI
Niagara Falls ON  L2H 0G5
Canada
Phone: (905) 354-8448
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Niagara Health System
St Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: (905) 323-7559
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marian Kotrec Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kotrec ( CPSO# 83741 )

Business Address:
Niagara Health System
St. Catharines General Site
Cardiology Diagnostics Lab
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
Cardiology Associates of Niagara
464 Welland Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2M 5V4
Phone Number: (905) 935-0312

Business Address:
7885 McLeod Road
Suite 114
Niagara Falls ON  L2H 0G5
Phone Number: (905) 354-8448

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 10 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIAN KOTREC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOTREC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2005 to 28 Oct 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 29 Oct 2005 to 31 May 2006
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 28 Aug 2011 to 21 Sep 2011
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

McMaster University, 17 Nov 2011 to 30 Nov 2011
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 08 Mar 2012 to 21 Mar 2012
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2012