Kottachchi, Dan Dayantha Tilan (CPSO#: 82493)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: Kottachchi, Dayantha Tilan (used until: 03 Mar 2009 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
125 Delhi St
Unit 333
Guelph ON  N1E 4J5
Phone: (519) 265-0461
Fax: (519) 265-0538
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dan Kottachchi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kottachchi ( CPSO# 82493 )

Business Address:
125 Dehli Street
Suite 333
Guelph ON  N1E 4J5
Phone Number: (519) 265-0461

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Palmerston & District Site,North Wellington Health Care Corp Palmerston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 14 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAN DAYANTHA TILAN KOTTACHCHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOTTACHCHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009