Kounine, Michael (CPSO#: 80208)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Donetsk Medical Institute, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ontario Shores Centre For Mental
Health Sciences
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Phone: (905) 430-4055 Ext. 6998
Fax: (905) 430-4464
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 101
1520 Steeles Avenue West
Vaughan ON  L4K 3B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 597-4457
Fax: (905)597-4458
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 28 Apr 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL KOUNINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOUNINE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2003
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Sep 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 Sep 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2005