Koutsoukos, Georgios (CPSO#: 77090)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104
1920 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3E2
Phone: (416) 481-8054
Fax: (416) 481-8056
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Georgios Koutsoukos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Koutsoukos ( CPSO# 77090 )

Business Address:
104 - 1920 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3E2
Phone Number: (416) 481-8054

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 21 Apr 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGIOS KOUTSOUKOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOUTSOUKOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2009