Kovacs, David Paul Robert (CPSO#: 71228)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
304 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8W 1E6
Phone: 6139679900
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chanda and Kovacs Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chanda ( CPSO# 69952 )
Dr. D. Kovacs ( CPSO# 71228 )

Business Address:
304 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 1E6
Phone Number: (613) 967-9900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID PAUL ROBERT KOVACS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOVACS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002