Koyle, Martin Allan (CPSO#: 96296)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Paediatric Urology
Black Wing, Room 299
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6580
Fax: (416) 813-7869
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 06 Nov 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 May 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 16 May 2013 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr.  Martin Allan Koyle may practise medicine independently in paediatric
                  urology and transplant, only.
                  
                  

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: September 19, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)