Kozar, Walter Joseph (CPSO#: 63803)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 79002
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
Emergency Department
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 795-5555 Ext. 19002
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W. Joseph Kozar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Kozar ( CPSO# 63803 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Emergency Department
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
Emergency Department
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 795-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WALTER JOSEPH KOZAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOZAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 14 Feb 1996 to 13 Aug 1996
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 27 Jul 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1992